EP0392475 - Analysis apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO. LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1990/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaji, Kazutaka, c/o Idemitsu Petroch. Co. Ltd. 1660, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-cho Kimitsu-gun, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Takase, Minoru, c/o Idemitsu Petroch. Co. Ltd. 1660, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-cho Kimitsu-gun, Chiba-ken / JP | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90106887.4 | 10.04.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | JP19890092367 | 11.04.1989 Original published format: JP 9236789 | [1990/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0392475 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0392475 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28, G01N15/14, G01N33/49, G01N35/00 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
G01N35/00 (EP);
G01N33/49 (KR);
G01N1/2813 (EP);
G01N15/042 (EP);
G01N2001/2846 (EP);
G01N2015/045 (EP);
G01N2035/00504 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/42] | Title | German: | Analysevorrichtung | [1990/42] | English: | Analysis apparatus | [1990/42] | French: | Appareil d'analyse | [1990/42] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 28.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/45] | 13.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP58160843 ; | [Y]US3962040 (CAMPBELL JEPTHA E, et al); | [A]US4183973 (BEATY ROBERT C [US], et al); | [A]US4470954 (CHIKNAS STEVEN G [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 286 (P-244)[1431], 21st December 1983; & JP-A-58 160 843 (HORIBA SEISAKUSHO) 24-09-1983, & JP58160843 A 00000000 |