Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] |
02.03.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] |
22.05.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.07.1992 [1992/28] |
08.10.1991 | First examination report | |
21.03.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.05.1991 [1991/19] |
23.11.1990 | Change - designated states | published on 09.01.1991 [1991/02] |
01.09.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] |