EP0392488 - Optical video disc player [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Noriyuki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90106921.1 | 11.04.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | JP19890093383 | 13.04.1989 Original published format: JP 9338389 | [1990/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0392488 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0392488 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0392488 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G11B7/085, H04N5/93 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
G11B7/0037 (EP,US);
G11B20/18 (EP,US);
G11B7/08517 (EP,US);
H04N5/95 (EP,US);
H04N5/953 (EP,US);
H04N9/85 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/42] | G11B7/00, G11B7/085 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1990/42] | Title | German: | Optisches Videoplattenspielgerät | [1990/42] | English: | Optical video disc player | [1990/42] | French: | Tourne-disques pour disques vidéo-optiques | [1990/42] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/42] | 17.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0236944 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US4777538 (KWAK KUK Y [KR]); | [A]GB2112968 (PIONEER VIDEO CORP); | [A]US4485412 (SUGIYAMA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) | Examination | EP0381150 |