EP0383369 - Combination of a rotating valve and a driving gear being connected by a device provided with levers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/34] | Device provided with levers to link a driving-gear to the spindle of a rotating valve | ||
[1993/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC. 1600 Pacific Avenue P.O. Box 718 Dallas Texas 75221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC. 1600 Pacific Avenue P.O. Box 718 Dallas Texas 75221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauze, Bernard 41, rue du Champ Blanc F-42290 Sorbiers / FR | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Louis François CABINET Louis LE GUEN 38, rue Levavasseur B.P. 91 35802 Dinard Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | Le Guen, Louis François CABINET Louis LE GUEN 38, rue Levavasseur B.P. 91 F-35802 Dinard Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90107043.3 | 28.04.1986 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | FR19850007083 | 10.05.1985 Original published format: FR 8507083 | [1990/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0383369 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0383369 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0383369 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/163, F16H21/44 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
F16K31/1635 (EP);
F16K1/221 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/34] | Title | German: | Anordnung bestehend aus einer Drehklappe und einem Antriebsorgan, verbunden durch ein Hebelgestänge | [1993/44] | English: | Combination of a rotating valve and a driving gear being connected by a device provided with levers | [1993/44] | French: | Combinaison d'une vanne à arbre rotatif et un organe de commande étant reliés entre eux par un dispositif à leviers | [1993/44] |
Former [1990/34] | Hebelgestänge zum Koppeln eines Antriebsorgans mit der Achse einer Drehklappe | ||
Former [1990/34] | Device provided with levers to link a driving-gear to the spindle of a rotating valve | ||
Former [1990/34] | Dispositif de liaison à leviers entre un organe d'actionnement et l'arbre d'une vanne rotative | Examination procedure | 08.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 22.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86902436.4 / EP0222790 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.11.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 03.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58113681 ; | [AD]US3927573 (SHEESLEY JOHN M, et al); | [A]GB2005373 (BORSIG GMBH) | [A] - MACHINE DESIGN. vol. 35, no. 11, 09 mai 63, CLEVELAND US page 219 "Scanning the field for ideas" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 221 (M-246)(1366) 30 septembre 1983, & JP-A-58 113681 (TOMOE GIJUTSUKENKYUSHO K.K.) 06 juillet 1983,, & JP58113681 A 00000000 |