EP0394790 - Device for making a fluid reactive mixture from at least two fluid reactive components for making solid or cellular plastic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK HENNECKE GmbH D-51379 Leverkusen / DE | [1990/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Proksa, Ferdinand, Dr. Am Arenzberg 9 D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | 02 /
Sulzbach, Hans-Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Hermann-Löns-Strasse 12 D-5330 Königswinter 21 / DE | 03 /
Althausen, Ferdinand Wiescheider Strasse 16 D-5206 Neunkirchen 1 / DE | 04 /
Raffel, Reiner, Dipl.-Ing. Müschbungert 2 D-5200 Siegburg / DE | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Kirchner, Dietrich, et al c/o Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | Kirchner, Dietrich, Dr., et al c/o Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90107139.9 | 13.04.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | DE19893913681 | 26.04.1989 Original published format: DE 3913681 | [1990/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0394790 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394790 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/76 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
B29B7/7642 (EP,US);
B29B7/582 (EP);
B29B7/7471 (EP,US);
B29B7/7615 (EP,US);
B29B7/7657 (EP);
B29B7/72 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen eines fliessfähigen Reaktionsgemisches aus mindestens zwei fliessfähigen Reaktionskomponenten für die Herstellung von massiven oder zelligen Kunststoffen | [1990/44] | English: | Device for making a fluid reactive mixture from at least two fluid reactive components for making solid or cellular plastic material | [1990/44] | French: | Dispositif pour la fabrication d'un mélange réactif apte à couler à partir d'au moins deux composants réactifs aptes à couler pour la fabrication de matières plastiques massives ou cellulaires | [1990/44] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 14.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2096522 (BAYER AG); | [A]DE3014175 (SCHNEIDER FRITZ WALTER); | [A]DE3334375 (ELASTOGRAN MASCH BAU [DE]) |