EP0393591 - Method and apparatus for determining refractive index distribution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Ichirou Rikagaku Kenkyusho, 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | 02 /
Shimada, Tadakatsu, Fine Functional Materials Lab. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd., 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-01 / JP | 03 /
Koya, Kazuo, Fine Functional Materials Lab. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd., 132-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-01 / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Toshiyuki, Shinetsu Engineering Co., Ltd. 4-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/43] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90107269.4 | 17.04.1990 | [1990/43] | Priority number, date | JP19890097055 | 17.04.1989 Original published format: JP 9705589 | JP19890097056 | 17.04.1989 Original published format: JP 9705689 | [1990/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0393591 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0393591 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0393591 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/41 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
G01N21/412 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung des Brechzahlprofils | [1990/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for determining refractive index distribution | [1990/43] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour déterminer la distribution d'indice de réfraction | [1990/43] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 01.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP63095336 ; | [A]EP0174708 (UNIV KYOTO [JP]); | [A]WO8102634 (NAT RES DEV [GB], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 334 (P-756)[3181], 8th September 1988; & JP-A-63 095 336 (FUJIKURA LTD) 26-04-1988, & JP63095336 A 00000000 | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, vol. 68, no. 10, 1980, pages 1198-1203, IEEE, New York, US; H.M. PRESBY et al.: "The index-profile characterization of fiber preforms and drawn fibers" | [A] - I.E.E.E. JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, vol. QE-18, no. 10, 1982, pages 1451-1465, IEEE, New York, US; W.J. STEWART: "Optical fiber and preform profiling technology" |