EP0452522 - Method for applying a water repellant composition with a water carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 2601 Northwest Expressway Suite 113OE Oklahoma City Oklahoma 73112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states ADVANCED CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 2601 Northwest Expressway Suite 113OE Oklahoma City Oklahoma 73112 / US | ||
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states ADVANCED CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGIES COMPANY 2601 N.W. Expressway, Suite 300 E Oklahoma City, Oklahoma 73112-7138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stout, Mike F. 1210 Windmill Road Oklahoma City, Oklahoma 73162 / US | 02 /
Brunken, Dean 3601 N.E. 140 Terrace Court Edmond, Oklahoma, 73013 / US | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90107281.9 | 17.04.1990 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0452522 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0452522 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18, C04B41/49, B05D1/02, B05D5/08 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
C14C9/00 (EP,US);
A62D5/00 (EP,US);
C04B41/4922 (EP,US);
C04B41/4961 (EP,US);
C09K17/36 (EP,US);
C09K17/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anwendung einer Wasserzurückstossenden Zusammensetzung mit einem wässerigen Mittel | [1991/43] | English: | Method for applying a water repellant composition with a water carrier | [1991/43] | French: | Méthode pour appliquer une composition hydrofuge avec un support aqueux | [1991/43] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 21.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/33] | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP63120773 [ ]; | [X]EP0234024 (PCR [US]); | [Y]EP0285134 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [A]US4012355 (NIMERICK KENNETH H); | [Y]US2543294 (MCCABE HARRY W) | [ ] - PATENT OFFICE OF JAPAN, FILE SUPPLIER JAPS; & JP,A,63 120 773 (TORAY SILICONE CO., LTD), whole abstract., & JP63120773 A 00000000 |