EP0448766 - Mixer-dryer, or apparatus for working or processing liquid, pasty, moist and dry products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred Bolz GmbH & Co. KG Isnyer Strasse 76 D-88239 Wangen / DE | [1991/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kugler, Johann Dipl. Ing. Engelitz D-8994 Hergatz / DE | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing., Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 D-88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 90107482.3 | 19.04.1990 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | DE19904009926 | 28.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4009926 | [1991/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0448766 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0448766 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F26B7/00, F26B11/12 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
F26B7/00 (EP);
B01F27/84 (EP);
F26B11/14 (EP);
F26B23/10 (EP);
B01F27/091 (EP);
B01F27/15 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/40] | F26B11/12, F26B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/40] | Title | German: | Mischtrockner bzw. Vorrichtung zum Be- und Verarbeiten von flüssigen, pastösen, feuchten und trockenen Produkten | [1991/40] | English: | Mixer-dryer, or apparatus for working or processing liquid, pasty, moist and dry products | [1991/40] | French: | Séchoir malaxeur, ou dispositif pour l'usinage et le traitement de produits liquides, pâteux, humides et secs | [1991/40] | File destroyed: | 15.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/41] | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.03.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3877881 (ONO KAORU, et al); | [X]US3206287 (CRAWFORD JAMES R); | [X]US3681308 (IRVIN HOWARD B, et al); | [Y]FR73808E (RUHRCHEMIE AG); | [A]FR871961 ; | [Y]GB2072030 (CHEMETRON PROCESS EQUIP); | [A]GB2130699 (NEUVONEN KAI LENNART); | [A]FR2274638 (HEDRICH VAKUUMANLAGEN WILHELM [DE]); | [A]US2367149 (SMITH HERSCHEL G) |