EP0394874 - Lithographic printing plate material improved in water retention characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS, LTD. 4-2, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS, LTD. 4-2, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamano, Motozo, c/o Kyoto Factory of Mitsubishi Paper Mills Limited, 6-6 Kaiden 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi / JP | 02 /
Nishinoiri, Hiroshi, c/o Kyoto Factory of Mitsubishi Paper Mills Limited, 6-6 Kaiden 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi / JP | 03 /
Iguchi, Shigeru, c/o Kyoto Factory of Mitsubishi Paper Mills Limited, 6-6 Kaiden 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi / JP | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90107552.3 | 20.04.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | JP19890105434 | 24.04.1989 Original published format: JP 10543489 | [1990/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0394874 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0394874 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394874 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/07 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
G03F7/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1990/44] | Title | German: | Material für eine Flachdruckplatte mit verbesserter Wasserführung | [1990/44] | English: | Lithographic printing plate material improved in water retention characteristics | [1990/44] | French: | Matériau pour plaque lithographique à rétention d'eau modifiée | [1993/42] |
Former [1990/44] | Matériel pour plaque lithographique à rétention d'encre modifiée | Examination procedure | 06.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 19.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.1994
01.09.1994
ADMISSIBLE Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel (Antwerpen) / BE | [1994/34] | 07.09.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.03.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.11.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.12.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.10.1993 | FR | 20.10.1993 | GB | 20.04.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/19] | BE | 20.10.1993 | |
FR | 11.03.1994 | ||
GB | 20.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | BE | 20.10.1993 | |
FR | 11.03.1994 | ||
Former [1994/38] | BE | 20.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2735381 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [A]EP0161662 (KURARAY CO [JP]) |