EP0388994 - Substituted pyridinesulfonamide compounds, herbicidal composition containing them, and method of preparing these compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD. No. 3-22, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD. No. 3-22, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Fumio, c/o Ishihara Sangyo K.K. Chuo Kenkyusho, 3-1, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga-ken / JP | 02 /
Haga, Takahiro, c/o Ishihara Sangyo K.K. Chuo Kenkyusho, 3-1, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga-ken / JP | 03 /
Sakashita, Nobuyuki, c/o Ishihara Sangyo K.K. Chuo Kenkyusho, 3-1, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga-ken / JP | 04 /
Honda, Chimoto, c/o Ishihara Sangyo K.K. Chuo Kenkyusho, 3-1, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga-ken / JP | 05 /
Murai, Shigeo, c/o Ishihara Sangyo K.K. Chuo Kenkyusho, 3-1, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga-ken / JP | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90107643.0 | 21.01.1987 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | JP19860019006 | 30.01.1986 Original published format: JP 1900686 | JP19860019863 | 31.01.1986 Original published format: JP 1986386 | JP19860086847 | 15.04.1986 Original published format: JP 8684786 | JP19860178489 | 29.07.1986 Original published format: JP 17848986 | [1990/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0388994 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0388994 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, A01N47/36, C07D213/81, C07D213/82, C07D213/89, // C07D213/80 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
C07D213/82 (EP);
C07D401/12 (KR);
A01N47/36 (EP);
C07D521/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/39] | Title | German: | Substituierte Pyridinsulfonamidverbindungen, diese enthaltende herbizide Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Herstellung dieser Verbindungen | [1990/39] | English: | Substituted pyridinesulfonamide compounds, herbicidal composition containing them, and method of preparing these compounds | [1990/39] | French: | Composés de pyridinesulfonamide substitués, compositions herbicides les contenant et procédé pour la préparation de ces composés | [1990/39] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/39] | 19.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87300502.9 / EP0232067 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0007687 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0030138 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0035893 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0013480 ; | [Y]EP0101407 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [AD]EP0101670 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) | Examination | EP0237292 |