EP0394924 - Photosensitive lithographic printing plate requiring no wetting water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | |||
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomiyasu, Hiroshi 205 Daiya Paresu Tama-center, 2-25 Minamino 3chome Tama-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kasakura, Akeo Onda-ryo, 23-4 Tana-cho, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Norihito 35-4 Kinugaoka 1-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Nakajima, Akihisa Konica Owada-ryo, 5-19 Owado-cho 2-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90107663.8 | 23.04.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | JP19890104287 | 24.04.1989 Original published format: JP 10428789 | [1990/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0394924 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0394924 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394924 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/075, G03F7/11 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
B41N1/003 (EP);
G03F7/0752 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/44] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliche Flachdruckplatte, die kein Befeuchtungswasser benötigt | [1990/44] | English: | Photosensitive lithographic printing plate requiring no wetting water | [1990/44] | French: | Plaque d'impression lithographique photosensible ne nécessitant pas d'eau de mouillage | [1990/44] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 07.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.07.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1996/19] | FR | 08.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP60229031 ; | [A]DE3816211 ; | [A]EP0242143 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 93 (P-445)(2150) 10 April 1986, & JP-A-60 229031 (FUJI SHASHIN FILM K.K.) 14 November 1985,, & JP60229031 A 19851114 |