EP0394954 - Strong nonwoven fabrics from engineered multiconstituent fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIBERWEB NORTH AMERICA, INC. 840 Southeast Main Street Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | [1996/14] |
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states FIBERWEB NORTH AMERICA, INC. 545 North Pleasantburg Drive Greenville, South Carolina 29607 / US | ||
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states JAMES RIVER CORPORATION 800 Connecticut Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gessner, Scott L. 204 East Prentiss Avenue Greenville, South Carolina 29605 / US | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Schupfner, Gerhard D., et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1 21244 Buchholz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Schupfner, Gerhard D., et al Patentanwälte Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 17 53 D-21236 Buchholz / DE | ||
Former [1991/22] | Schupfner, Gerhard D. Patentanwälte Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 17 53 D-21236 Buchholz / DE | ||
Former [1990/44] | Schupfner, Gerhard D. Patentanwälte Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 17 53 D-21236 Buchholz / DE | Application number, filing date | 90107747.9 | 24.04.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | US19890344744 | 28.04.1989 Original published format: US 344744 | [1990/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0394954 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0394954 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394954 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/42 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
A61F13/51458 (EP,US);
A61F13/51401 (EP,US);
A61F13/5148 (EP,US);
B01D39/083 (EP,US);
B01D39/1607 (EP,US);
D04H1/541 (EP,US);
D04H1/559 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0216 (EP,US);
B01D2239/04 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0407 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0414 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0457 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0622 (EP,US);
B01D2239/065 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1233 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1291 (EP,US);
Y10S428/903 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2929 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2931 (EP,US);
Y10T428/298 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3707 (EP,US);
Y10T442/611 (EP,US);
Y10T442/615 (EP,US);
Y10T442/62 (EP,US);
Y10T442/621 (EP,US);
Y10T442/637 (EP,US);
Y10T442/66 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/44] | Title | German: | Starke nicht-gewebte Stoffe aus entwickelten Fasern mit mehreren Bestandteilen | [1990/44] | English: | Strong nonwoven fabrics from engineered multiconstituent fibers | [1990/44] | French: | Etoffes résistantes non tissées faites avec des fibres développées à constituants multiples | [1990/44] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 07.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4477516 (SUGIHARA TAIZO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0159427 (CHISSO CORP [JP]); | [A]US4551378 (CAREY JR PATRICK H [US]); | [A]EP0171806 (CHICOPEE [US]); | [A]EP0171807 (CHICOPEE [US]); | [A]EP0233433 (HUET ANDRE ETS [FR]); | [A]US4722857 (TOMIOKA SUSUMU [JP], et al); | [AP]US4861633 (ABE MORIO [JP]) | by applicant | US3369057 | US3382305 | US3595731 | US3620892 | US4361609 | US4568506 | US4632861 | EP0277707 | US4769279 | US4770925 | US19880220203 |