EP0396004 - Laser scanning system for reading bar codes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. 116 Wilbur Place Bohemia New York 11716-3300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 116 Wilbur Place Bohemia New York 11716-3300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siemiatkowski, Bish 26125 Pierce Road Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/45] | Wagner, Karl H., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90107787.5 | 24.04.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | US19890345881 | 01.05.1989 Original published format: US 345881 | [1990/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0396004 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0396004 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0396004 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
G06K17/0022 (EP);
G06K7/10881 (EP);
G06K7/109 (EP);
G07G1/0045 (EP);
G07G1/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/45] | Title | German: | Laser-Abtastsystem zum Lesen von Strichkodierungen | [1990/45] | English: | Laser scanning system for reading bar codes | [1990/45] | French: | Système de balayage laser pour lecture de code à barre | [1990/45] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/13: Teilanmeldung 96120633.1 eingereicht am 20/12/96 | EPB 1997/13: Divisional application 96120633.1 filed on 20/12/96 | EPB 1997/13: Demande divisionnaire 96120633.1 déposée le 20/12/96 | Examination procedure | 02.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 27.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 15.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96120633.1 / EP0770970 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Request for further processing for: | 20.12.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0194115 ; | [Y]FR2566572 ; | [Y]US4766297 ; | [A]US4639606 ; | [A]US4072859 ; | [A]EP0262943 |