EP0398046 - Process for making a flexible ceramic element and flexible ceramic element obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZIRCOA, INC. 31501 Solon Road Solon Ohio 44139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states ZIRCOA, INC. 31501 Solon Road Solon Ohio 44139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Searle, Ralph 34476 Blue Heron Drive Solon, Ohio 33139 / US | 02 /
Leistner, Hans, Dr. Selztalstrasse 153 D-6507 Ingelheim / DE | 03 /
Brückner, Raimund Gartenfeldstrasse 21a D-6272 Engenhahn / DE | 04 /
Mentesh, Ibrahim 1536 Laclede, South Euclid Ohio 44121 / US | 05 /
Levadnuk, Edward 1217 Coldstream Drive Raleigh, North Carolina 27615 / US | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Brückner, Raimund Didier-Werke AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 1 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Brückner, Raimund, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Didier-Werke AG Lessingstrasse 16-18 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 90107809.7 | 25.04.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | US19890353323 | 15.05.1989 Original published format: US 353323 | [1990/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0398046 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0398046 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0398046 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/00, B28B11/12, F16F1/02, F16F1/04 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
F16F1/022 (EP,US);
B28B1/00 (EP,US);
B28B11/12 (EP,US);
F16F1/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/131 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/47] | B28B1/00, F16F1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines flexiblen keramischen Elements sowie flexibles keramisches Element | [1990/47] | English: | Process for making a flexible ceramic element and flexible ceramic element obtained thereby | [1990/47] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un élément flexible en matière céramique et élément flexible en matière céramique ainsi obtenu | [1990/47] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 11.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.12.1995 | DK | 06.12.1995 | GR | 06.12.1995 | IT | 06.12.1995 | NL | 06.12.1995 | SE | 06.03.1996 | ES | 17.03.1996 | [2008/01] |
Former [2004/03] | BE | 06.12.1995 | |
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
GR | 06.12.1995 | ||
IT | 06.12.1995 | ||
NL | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 06.03.1996 | ||
ES | 17.03.1996 | ||
Former [2003/07] | BE | 06.12.1995 | |
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
GR | 06.12.1995 | ||
IT | 06.12.1995 | ||
NL | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 06.03.1996 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 06.12.1995 | |
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
GR | 06.12.1995 | ||
IT | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 06.03.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 06.12.1995 | |
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
IT | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 06.03.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 06.12.1995 | |
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 06.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/32] | BE | 06.12.1995 | |
SE | 06.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 06.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61088033 ; | [A]JP1021233 ; | [A]JP1006537 ; | [A]FR1248541 ; | [A]FR2182597 (CENTRE NAT ETD SPATIALES [FR]); | [A]EP0220769 (ELECTRONIQUE & PHYSIQUE [FR], et al); | [Y]WO8801723 (COORS PORCELAIN CO [US]); | [Y]US4735638 (CILIBERTI DAVID F [US], et al); | [X]US4742030 (MASAKI TAKAKI [JP], et al) | [A] - WORLD PATENT INDEX LATEST, AN 86-153587, Woche 8624, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP-A-61 088 033 (KYOCERA CORP.) 6. Mai 1986, & JP61088033 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 194 (M-823)(3542) 10. Mai 1989; & JP-A-1 021 233 (MEIWA KOGYO K.K. ) 24. Januar 1989, & JP1021233 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 177 (M-818)(3525) 26. April 1989; & JP-A-1 006 537 (IBIDEN CO LTD ) 11. Januar 1989, & JP1006537 A 00000000 |