EP0418466 - High level clamp driver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burke, Ronald D. 8893 Bond Court Manassas, VA 22110 / US | 02 /
Mattes, Carl J. 9800 Moor Green Drive Manassas, VA 22110 / US | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/31] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/19] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/12] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Elmar Ott, Dipl.-Ing. Peter Klocke, Dipl.-Phys. Hans-J. Neubauer, Kappelstrasse 8 D-72160 Horb / DE | ||
Former [1991/13] | Gaugel, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland GmbH Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108084.6 | 27.04.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | US19890408978 | 18.09.1989 Original published format: US 408978 | [1991/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0418466 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0418466 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0418466 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/12 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
H04L25/028 (EP,US);
H04L25/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/13] | Title | German: | Hochpegel-Klemmtreiberschaltung | [1991/13] | English: | High level clamp driver | [1991/13] | French: | Circuit d'attaque et de verrouillage du niveau haut d'un signal | [1991/13] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0090255 (IBM [US]); | [A]US4825099 (BARTON STEVEN K [US]); | [A]US4766334 (WARNER RICHARD C [US]) |