EP0396050 - Method for manufacturing wearable article components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182, Shimobun Kinsei Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182, Shimobun Kinsei Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states UNICHARM K.K. 182 Shimobun, Kinsei Kawanoe-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ochi, Mitsuzo 4-172 Oazafujihara, Doi-cho Uma-gun, Ehime-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakano, Shoji 160 Yoshioka-cho, Kanonji-shi Kagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Hosakawa, Masashi 3941 Oazakanda, Yamamoto-chi Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken / JP | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108104.2 | 27.04.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | JP19890111698 | 29.04.1989 Original published format: JP 11169889 | [1990/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0396050 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0396050 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0396050 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
A61F13/15699 (EP,US);
A61F13/15723 (EP,US);
B31D1/04 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1015 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Bekleidungselementen | [1990/45] | English: | Method for manufacturing wearable article components | [1990/45] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'éléments d'articles à porter | [1990/45] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 08.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.1995 | BE | 15.03.1995 | CH | 15.03.1995 | DK | 15.03.1995 | GR | 15.03.1995 | LI | 15.03.1995 | LU | 30.04.1995 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
BE | 15.03.1995 | ||
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
DK | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
BE | 15.03.1995 | ||
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | CH | 15.03.1995 | |
LI | 15.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8303051 (BEGHIN SAY SA [FR]); | [A]EP0216164 (BOUSSAC SAINT FRERES BSF [FR]); | [AD]US4760764 (DE JONCKHEERE RAPHAEL [FR], et al) |