EP0453621 - Polymer-modified drugs having enhanced biological and pharmacological activities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036 / US | ||
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. Grace Plaza, 1114 Ave. of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braatz, James, A. 4510 Yates Road Beltsville, MD 20705 / US | 02 /
Heifetz, Aaron, Herman 5419 Tall Window Way Columbia, MD 21046 / US | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108193.5 | 28.04.1990 | [1991/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0453621 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
A61K47/62 (EP);
A61K47/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/44] | Title | German: | Polymermodifizierte Arzneimittel mit verbesserter biologischer und pharmakologischer Wirksamkeit | [1991/44] | English: | Polymer-modified drugs having enhanced biological and pharmacological activities | [1991/44] | French: | Médicaments-polymères à actions biologique et pharmacologique améliorées | [1991/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 06.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/32] | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]FR2371470 ; | [Y]EP0184233 | [X] - STN FILE SERVER (Karlsruhe), & FILE MEDLINE, accession no. 79250390; "Production and properties of trypsin immobilized on a polyurethane matrix", & UKR. BIOKHIM. ZH, (1979 Jul-Aug) 51(4), 319-23 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 99, no. 24, December 1983, page 335, abstract no. 200461g, Columbus, Ohio, US; T.E. LIPATOVA et al.: "Enzymic degradation of segmented polyurethanes with sugar residues in the main chain", & UKR. BIOKHIM. ZH. 1983, 55(5), 539-43 |