EP0396125 - Forward conventer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | For:BE
CH
DK
ES
FR
GB
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
Alcatel N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:BE
CH
DK
ES
FR
GB
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
ALCATEL N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wölfel, Werner Pirmasenser Strasse 32 D-7000 Stuttgart 31 / DE | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | Pechhold, Eberhard, et al Alcatel Alsthom Intellectual Property Department, Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | Pechhold, Eberhard, Dipl.-Phys., et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108338.6 | 03.05.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | DE19893914799 | 05.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3914799 | [1990/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0396125 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0396125 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0396125 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
H02M3/33592 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/45] | Title | German: | Durchflusswandler | [1990/45] | English: | Forward conventer | [1990/45] | French: | Conventisseur direct | [1990/45] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 03.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 08.09.1993 | GR | 08.09.1993 | SE | 08.09.1993 | LU | 31.05.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 08.09.1993 | |
SE | 08.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | SE | 08.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4672303 (NEWTON STEPHEN F [US]); | [AD]DE3727170 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]); | [XP]US4870555 (WHITE ALAN V [US]) | by applicant | DE3727170 |