EP0397154 - Pad for air bag device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Nagahata, Ochiai, Haruhimura Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Nagahata, Ochiai, Haruhimura Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiraki, Kouji 251-12, Karumi Shinsei-cho, Motosu-gun, Gifu-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Tadashi 1108, 21-2, Tonyamachi, Nishibiwajima-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Shinto, Hiroaki 4-40-6, Nishiyama-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/46] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108756.9 | 09.05.1990 | [1990/46] | Priority number, date | JP19890053654U | 10.05.1989 Original published format: JP 5365489 U | [1990/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0397154 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397154 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [1990/46] | CPC: |
B60R21/21656 (EP,US);
B60R2021/21543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/46] | Title | German: | Polster für eine einen Luftsack enthaltende Vorrichtung | [1990/46] | English: | Pad for air bag device | [1990/46] | French: | Garniture rembourrée pour dispositif de sac à air | [1990/46] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63199149 ; | [YD]JP5720177B ; | EP0284123 [ ] (KOLBENSCHMIDT AG [DE]); | JPS5720177B [ ]; | DE3811373 [ ] (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 478 (M-775)[3325], 14th December 1988; & JP-A-63 199 149 (TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD) 17-08-1988, & JP63199149 A 00000000 | [YD] - JP-B-5720177, & JP5720177B B 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 478 (M-775)(3325) 14 December 1988, & JP-A-63 199149 (TOYODA GOSEI CO.,LTD) 17 August 1988,, & JP63199149 A 19880817 | Examination | JPH05720177B |