EP0398153 - Aqueous functional liquids containing a poly(meth)acrylat thickening agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states RÖHM GMBH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langerbeins, Klaus, Dr. Am oberen Luisenpark 17 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Hitzler, Otto Wilhelm-Leuschner Strasse 57 D-6106 Erzhausen / DE | 03 /
Trabitzsch, Hans, Dr. Weingartenstrasse 7 D-6104 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 04 /
Böhmke, Uwe Schulzweg 7 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
Fölsch, Karl-Josef, Dr. Backhaushohl 19 D-6500 Mainz / DE | [1990/47] | Application number, filing date | 90108785.8 | 10.05.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | DE19893916128 | 18.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3916128 | [1990/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0398153 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C10M173/02, // (C10M173/02, 145:14),(C10N40/08, 40:20) | [1990/47] | CPC: |
C10M145/14 (EP);
C10M173/02 (EP);
C10M2201/02 (EP);
C10M2209/084 (EP);
C10N2040/08 (EP);
C10N2040/20 (EP);
C10N2050/01 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M173/02, C10M145/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/47] | Title | German: | Wässrige Funktionsflüssigkeiten enthaltend Verdickungsmittel auf Poly(meth)acrylat-Basis | [1990/47] | English: | Aqueous functional liquids containing a poly(meth)acrylat thickening agent | [1990/47] | French: | Liquides fonctionnels aqueux contenant un agent épaississant à base de poly(méth)acrylate | [1990/47] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 14.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/35] | 23.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57188699 ; | [XD]DE3404537 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]DE2529892 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD); | [A]EP0251192 (NIHON PARKERIZING [JP]); | [AD]EP0057875 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]GB2053264 (STEETLEY MINERALS LTD); | [A]FR2105236 (MOLLCO PATENTVERWERTUNG) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 98, Nr. 20, 1990, NLN-STN, Zusammenfassung Nr. 162524z, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-57 188 699 (SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES) November 1982, & JP57188699 A 00000000 |