EP0400374 - Device for fixing panes in door or window frames [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niemann, Hans-Dieter Am Hügel 17 50169 Kerpen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states Niemann, Hans-Dieter Am Hügel 17 D-50169 Kerpen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Sturies, Herbert Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Phys. Herbert Sturies Dipl.-Ing. Peter Eichler Postfach 20 18 31 D-42218 Wuppertal / DE | [1990/49] | Application number, filing date | 90108855.9 | 11.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | DE19890006547U | 27.05.1989 Original published format: DE 8906547 U | [1990/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400374 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400374 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400374 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/54 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
E06B3/5409 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/49] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Verklotzung von Scheiben in Tür- oder Fensterrahmen | [1990/49] | English: | Device for fixing panes in door or window frames | [1990/49] | French: | Dispositif pour la fixation de vitres dans des cadres de porte ou de fenêtre | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 15.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.01.1993 | DK | 20.01.1993 | ES | 20.01.1993 | FR | 20.01.1993 | GB | 20.01.1993 | IT | 20.01.1993 | NL | 20.01.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 20.01.1993 | |
DK | 20.01.1993 | ||
ES | 20.01.1993 | ||
GB | 20.01.1993 | ||
IT | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
FR | 11.06.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 20.01.1993 | |
DK | 20.01.1993 | ||
GB | 20.01.1993 | ||
IT | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
FR | 11.06.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 20.01.1993 | |
DK | 20.01.1993 | ||
GB | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
FR | 11.06.1993 | ||
Former [1993/49] | BE | 20.01.1993 | |
GB | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
FR | 11.06.1993 | ||
Former [1993/48] | BE | 20.01.1993 | |
GB | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | BE | 20.01.1993 | |
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | NL | 20.01.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7525175U ; | [AD]DE2044299 ; | [XP]DE8906547U |