EP0397185 - Permanently antistatic polymeric rigid containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Havens, Marvin, R. 206 Hackney Road Greer, South Carolina 29650 / US | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108873.2 | 11.05.1990 | [1990/46] | Priority number, date | US19890351239 | 12.05.1989 Original published format: US 351239 | [1990/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0397185 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B32B1/02, B32B27/00, B32B27/18, C08K5/19, C08K5/17, C09K3/16, C09J123/08, B65D90/46 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B65D81/24 (EP,KR);
B32B1/00 (KR,US);
C08K5/19 (EP,KR);
H01L21/67121 (EP,KR);
H05K9/0067 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [1990/46] | B32B1/02, B32B27/00, B32B27/18, B65D90/46, C08K5/19, C08K5/17, C09K3/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/46] | Title | German: | Permanent antistatische, steife Behälter aus polymerem Werkstoff | [1990/46] | English: | Permanently antistatic polymeric rigid containers | [1990/46] | French: | Récipients rigides, antistatiques de manière permanente, en polymère | [1990/46] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 13.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/28] | 19.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/45] | 05.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB938729 (ICI LTD); | [A]FR2407942 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [X]GB2028168 (ICI LTD); | [A]US4599366 (KESLING JR HAVEN S [US], et al); | [Y]US4623589 (SIMMONDS JR ROBERT C [US]); | [AD]US4623564 (LONG STUART G [US], et al) |