EP0397187 - Current supply device for an electro-erosion machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AG für industrielle Elektronik AGIE Losone bei Locarno CH-6616 Losone/Locarno / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | For all designated states AG für industrielle Elektronik AGIE Losone bei Locarno CH-6616 Losone/Locarno / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wehrli, Peter, Ing. ETH CH-6611 Auressio / CH | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108898.9 | 11.05.1990 | [1990/46] | Priority number, date | DE19893915614 | 12.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3915614 | [1990/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0397187 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397187 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B23H7/04 | [1990/46] | CPC: |
B23H7/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, SE [1990/46] | Title | German: | Stromzuführungsvorrichtung für eine Elektroerosionsmaschine | [1990/46] | English: | Current supply device for an electro-erosion machine | [1990/46] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en courant pour une machine d'électro-érosion | [1990/46] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 09.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 12.05.1993 | [1994/16] | Documents cited: | Search | JP60221220 [ ]; | JP61164727 [ ]; | [AD]US4263116 (INOUE KIYOSHI) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, M Sektion, Band 10, Nr. 81, 29. MÛrz 1986 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT Seite 50 M 465 & JP - A - 60 - 221 220 ( INOUE ), & JP60221220 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, M Sektion, Band 10, Nr. 372, 11. Dezember 1986 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT Seite 26 M 544 & JP - A - 61 - 164 727 ( INOUE ), & JP61164727 A 00000000 |