EP0398191 - Quadruple word, multiplexed, paged mode and cache memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thoma, Roy E., III 11514 Taos Lane, Houston Road Houston, Texas 77070 / US | 02 /
Miller, Joseph P. 17202 Camberwell Houston, Texas 77070 / US | 03 /
Skelton, Bill 12618 Campsite Trail Cypress, Texas 77429 / US | 04 /
Taylor, Mark 8450 N. Willow Place, No. 1807 Houston, Texas 77070 / US | 05 /
Bonella, Randy M. 15302 Maple Meadows Drive Cypress, Texas 77429 / US | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108942.5 | 11.05.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | US19890354349 | 19.05.1989 Original published format: US 354349 | [1990/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0398191 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0398191 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
G06F12/0886 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/47] | Title | German: | Vierfachwort-, Multiplex-Seitenmodusspeicher und Cache-Speicher | [1990/47] | English: | Quadruple word, multiplexed, paged mode and cache memory | [1990/47] | French: | Mémoire fonctionnant en mode page, à mot quadruple, multiplexée et antémémoire | [1990/47] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 09.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/51] | 22.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0149451 (WANG LABORATORIES [US]); | [A]EP0309995 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) |