EP0399375 - Method for the treatment and production of material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OUTOKUMPU OY Länsituulentie 7 A 02100 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states OUTOKUMPU OY Länsituulentie 7 A SF-02100 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taskinen, Pekka Antero Kotitontuntie 36 C SF-02100 Espoo / FI | 02 /
Kaskiala, Markku Juhani Topeliuksenkatu 7 B 31 SF-00250 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
Kemppinen, Seppo Tapio Käräjätie 12 as. 15 SF-28400 Ulvila / FI | 04 /
Niemelä, Jaana Liisa Lauttasaarentie 18 A 13 SF-00200 Helsinki / FI | 05 /
Volotinen, Heikki Juhani Rastaalantie 6 A 1 SF-02620 Espoo / FI | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Zipse + Habersack Kemnatenstrasse 49 D-80639 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/48] | ZIPSE & HABERSACK Kemnatenstrasse 49 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90109373.2 | 17.05.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | FI19890002515 | 24.05.1989 Original published format: FI 892515 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0399375 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0399375 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, C22C29/08, // C23C4/06 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
C22C29/08 (EP,US);
B22F1/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, GB, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung und Herstellung von Material | [1990/48] | English: | Method for the treatment and production of material | [1990/48] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement et la préparation de matériau | [1990/48] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 16.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2397253 (CASTOLIN SA [CH]); | [YD]EP0143343 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [XD]EP0259844 (GTE PROD CORP [US]) | Examination | GB2001947 |