EP0429746 - Sprung flange battery tray system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.1992 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.1992 [1992/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION PLASTICA LTD. Urbanizacion Acopi Cali / CO | [1991/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moreno-Cid Velasco, Francisco José Calle 58N 2GN-69 Casa No. 34, Cali / CO | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | Gonzalez Gonzalez, Pablo Avda. Alberto Alcocer n 5, 7 D 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | Gonzalez Gonzalez, Pablo Avda. Alberto Alcocer n 5, 7 D E-28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 90109446.6 | 19.06.1990 | [1991/23] | Priority number, date | ES19890004061 | 28.11.1989 Original published format: ES 8904061 | [1991/23] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0429746 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/04, H01M2/10 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
B60R16/04 (EP);
H01M50/227 (EP,US);
H01M50/262 (EP,US);
H01M50/264 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/32] |
Former [1991/23] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Batterie-Einsatzsystem mit federndem Flansch | [1991/23] | English: | Sprung flange battery tray system | [1991/23] | French: | Système de plateau pour batterie avec patte élastique | [1991/23] | File destroyed: | 21.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 29.11.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) SE | 06.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/33] | 13.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.01.1991 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.01.1992 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH613073 (ZOELLNER CARL ACCUMULATORENWER [DE]); | [A]DE2850898 ; | [A]EP0236622 (CLARK EQUIPMENT CO [US]); | [A]EP0238383 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al); | [A]DE3729611 (VARTA BATTERIE [DE]) |