Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH02305988 | 19.12.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12274089 | 18.05.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH02305989 | 19.12.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12274189 | 18.05.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH03134193 | 07.06.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26903289 | 18.10.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH03134194 | 07.06.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26903389 | 18.10.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0324291 | 01.02.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP15828989 | 22.06.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0361392 | 18.03.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP19386289 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0398358 | Global Dossier | 09.03.1994 | B1 | EP0398358 | 27.03.1991 | A3 | EP0398358 | 22.11.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP12274189 | 18.05.1989 | JP26903389 | 18.10.1989 | JP26903289 | 18.10.1989 | JP12274089 | 18.05.1989 | JP15828989 | 22.06.1989 | JP19386289 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69007163T | 04.08.1994 | T2 | DE69007163D1 | 14.04.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP12274189 | 18.05.1989 | JP26903389 | 18.10.1989 | JP26903289 | 18.10.1989 | JP12274089 | 18.05.1989 | JP15828989 | 22.06.1989 | JP19386289 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5041194 | 20.08.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12274189 | 18.05.1989 | JP26903389 | 18.10.1989 | JP26903289 | 18.10.1989 | JP12274089 | 18.05.1989 | JP15828989 | 22.06.1989 | JP19386289 | 28.07.1989 |