EP0398366 - Semiconductor processing apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue M/S 2061 Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara California 95054-3299 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Severns, David W. 1168 Tangerine Way Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 02 /
Tompson, Brian 4710 Del Loma Court Campell, California 95008 / US | 03 /
Lindstrom, Paul R. 120 Hawks Peak Road Aptos, California 95003 / US | 04 /
Carlson, David K. 2308 Dundee Drive Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Postfach 34 01 15 80098 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr., et al Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90109478.9 | 18.05.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | US19890354161 | 19.05.1989 Original published format: US 354161 | [1990/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0398366 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0398366 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0398366 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/44, H01L21/00 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
H01L21/68764 (EP,US);
C23C16/54 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/4401 (EP,US);
C30B25/02 (EP,US);
C30B35/005 (EP,US);
H01L21/68707 (EP,US);
H01L21/68771 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/47] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/47] | Title | German: | Halbleiterbehandlungsvorrichtung und Verfahren | [1990/47] | English: | Semiconductor processing apparatus and method | [1990/47] | French: | Appareil de manipulation de semi-conducteur et méthode | [1990/47] | Examination procedure | 02.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 12.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.09.1994 | ES | 21.09.1994 | FR | 21.09.1994 | IT | 21.09.1994 | NL | 21.09.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 21.09.1994 | |
ES | 21.09.1994 | ||
IT | 21.09.1994 | ||
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
FR | 17.02.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 21.09.1994 | |
IT | 21.09.1994 | ||
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
FR | 17.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | BE | 21.09.1994 | |
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
FR | 17.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/34] | BE | 21.09.1994 | |
FR | 17.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/27] | BE | 21.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2590879 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) |