EP0400461 - Photographic cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Messalti, Mansour c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Dept. 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | 02 /
Muller, Bruce Robert c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Dept. 343 Statet Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Blickle, K. Werner, et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Blickle, K. Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90109728.7 | 22.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | US19890358995 | 30.05.1989 Original published format: US 358995 | [1990/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400461 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400461 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400461 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03B42/04 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
G03B42/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/49] | Title | German: | Fotografische Kassette | [1990/49] | English: | Photographic cassette | [1990/49] | French: | Cassette photographique | [1990/49] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 04.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 27.10.1993 | FR | 27.10.1993 | GB | 22.05.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/19] | DE | 27.10.1993 | |
FR | 18.03.1994 | ||
GB | 22.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | DE | 27.10.1993 | |
FR | 18.03.1994 | ||
Former [1994/32] | DE | 27.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4813063 (CARMICHAEL EVEN P [US], et al); | [A]EP0212624 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0204316 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]US3930165 (ROBINSON ALFRED, et al) |