EP0403813 - Method and apparatus for the dosed filling of liquid and pasty products, especially of foodstuffs or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benz & Hilgers GmbH Münster Strasse 246 40470 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states Benz & Hilgers GmbH Münster Strasse 246 D-40470 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böhm, Jürgen, Dr. Auf der Wiese 12 D-4044 Kaarst / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Georg Ernst-Moritz-Arndt-Strasse 7 D-5620 Velbert 1 / DE | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Pfeiffer, Helmut c/o Jagenberg AG Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Pfeiffer, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Jagenberg AG Kennedydamm 15-17 D-40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 90109756.8 | 22.05.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | DE19893919913 | 19.06.1989 Original published format: DE 3919913 | [1990/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0403813 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0403813 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/32, G01F11/06, F04B13/00 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
G01F11/023 (EP,US);
B65B3/32 (EP,US);
G01F11/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI [1990/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum dosierten Abfüllen von flüssigen und pastösen Produkten, insbesondere Nahrungsmitteln oder dergleichen | [1990/52] | English: | Method and apparatus for the dosed filling of liquid and pasty products, especially of foodstuffs or the like | [1990/52] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le remplissage dosé de produits liquides et pâteux, notamment de produits alimentaires ou autres semblables | [1990/52] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 26.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/12] | 12.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2900851 (BAYER AG); | [A]DE2308689 (BREITNER ABFUELLANLAGEN KG MAS) |