EP0400482 - Microvalve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.1995 [1995/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BÜRKERT GMBH & CO. Christian-Bürkert-Strasse 13-17 D-74653 Ingelfingen / DE | For all designated states KERNFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH Postfach 36 40 D-76021 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states BÜRKERT GMBH & CO. WERK INGELFINGEN Christian-Bürkert-Strasse 13-17 D-74653 Ingelfingen / DE | ||
For all designated states KERNFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH Postfach 36 40 D-76021 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
Former [1994/42] | For all designated states BÜRKERT GMBH & CO. WERK INGELFINGEN Christian-Bürkert-Strasse 13-17 D-74653 Ingelfingen / DE | ||
For all designated states KERNFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH Postfach 36 40 D-76050 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states BÜRKERT GMBH & CO. WERK INGELFINGEN Christian-Bürkert-Strasse 13-17 D-74653 Ingelfingen / DE | ||
For:DE
KERNFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH Postfach 36 40 D-76050 Karlsruhe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kowanz, Bernd Herm. Meierheuser-Strasse 1 D-7515 Linkenheim / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Dirk, Dr. Ringstrasse 3 D-7513 Stutensee 1 / DE | 03 /
Ehrfeld, Wolfgang, Dr. Reutstrasse 27 D-7500 Karlsruhe 41 / DE | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90109887.1 | 23.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | DE19893917396 | 29.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3917396 | [1990/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400482 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400482 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400482 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/02, F16K3/02 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
F16K31/02 (EP,US);
B65D90/587 (EP,US);
B65D90/60 (EP,US);
F16K3/02 (EP,US);
F16K3/0254 (EP,US);
F16K99/0001 (EP,US);
F16K99/0011 (EP,US);
F16K99/0051 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86718 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86759 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/49] | F16K3/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/49] | Title | German: | Mikroventil | [1990/49] | English: | Microvalve | [1990/49] | French: | Microvanne | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 22.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1905228 (BRUNSWICK CORP); | [A]US4538642 (SCHUTTEN HERMAN P [US], et al); | [A]GB2155152 (ALLIED CORP); | [A]EP0276156 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [AP]FR2639085 (NEUCHATEL UNIVERSITE [CH]) |