EP0400490 - Flat bed scanning type image reader [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishida, Yoshihiro, Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co. Ltd. 1-1 Tenjinkitamachi, Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori, Kamikyo-ku, Kyoto / JP | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90109924.2 | 25.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | JP19890137058 | 29.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13705889 | JP19890151419 | 13.06.1989 Original published format: JP 15141989 | [1990/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400490 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400490 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400490 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/387, H04N1/10 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
H04N1/1008 (EP,US);
H04N1/3875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/49] | Title | German: | Bildlesevorrichtung vom Flachbettabtastungstyp | [1990/49] | English: | Flat bed scanning type image reader | [1990/49] | French: | Dispositif pour la lecture d'images du type d'analyse à support plan | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 08.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.06.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1996/18] | FR | 24.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2142499 (CANON KK); | [A]DE3615865 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]); | [AD]EP0303960 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) |