EP0401634 - Metering valve for the metered delivery of color pigments particularly in apparatuses for mixing coloring substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MS MACCHINE E SISTEMI S.r.l. Via Matteotti 11 I-20021 Bollate(Milano) / IT | [1990/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pasquettin, Pierangelo Via Lamarmora 4 I-22070 Bregnano (Como) / IT | [1990/50] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90110048.7 | 28.05.1990 | [1990/50] | Priority number, date | IT19890020824 | 08.06.1989 Original published format: IT 2082489 | [1990/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0401634 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0401634 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/34, F16K3/02, B44D3/08 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
F16K3/0281 (EP);
B01F35/71805 (EP,US);
B01F35/71 (EP);
B44D3/003 (EP);
F16K3/34 (EP);
B01F2101/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/50] | F16K3/34, F16K3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1990/50] | Title | German: | Dosierventil für die dosierte abgabe von Farbpigmenten, insbesondere für Mischanlagen für Farbsubstanzen | [1990/50] | English: | Metering valve for the metered delivery of color pigments particularly in apparatuses for mixing coloring substances | [1990/50] | French: | Vanne de dosage pour la distribution dosée de pigments de couleur, en particulier pour appareillage de mixage de matières colorantes | [1990/50] | File destroyed: | 22.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/23] | 06.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3178058 (OGREN AXEL E); | [A]US3559947 (SETTE EDWARD F); | [A]EP0086259 (HAMILTON BONADUZ AG [CH]); | [A]EP0283137 (ICI PLC [GB]) |