EP0401646 - Metallic core member for catalytic converter and catalytic converter containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.12.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036 / US | ||
Former [1990/50] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. (a Connecticut corp.) Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whittenberg, William 12126 State Route 282 Garrettsville, Ohio 44231 / US | [1990/50] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90110181.6 | 29.05.1990 | [1990/50] | Priority number, date | US19890362089 | 06.06.1989 Original published format: US 362089 | [1990/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0401646 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/28, F01N3/20, B01D53/36, B01J35/04 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
F01N3/2857 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N3/2026 (EP,US);
F01N3/2814 (EP,US);
F01N3/2853 (EP,US);
F01N2330/04 (EP,US);
F01N2350/02 (EP,US);
F01N2510/00 (EP,US);
F01N2530/04 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/50] | Title | German: | Metallisches Kernelement für Katalysator und Katalysator, der dieses enthält | [1990/50] | English: | Metallic core member for catalytic converter and catalytic converter containing same | [1990/50] | French: | Elément de noyau métallique pour catalyseur et catalyseur le contenant | [1990/50] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/04] | 13.09.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4382323 (CHAPMAN LLOYD R, et al); | [Y]EP0245736 ; | [A]FR2321347 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK [GB]); | [A]EP0243952 (KEMIRA OY [FI]); | [AD]US4725411 (CORNELISON RICHARD C [US]); | [AD]US3770389 (KITZNER E, et al); | [AP]WO8910470 (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE]) |