EP0400603 - Monitoring method for stand-by circuits suitable for a multiplexing/demultiplexing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimada, Naohiro c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ohno, Yasushi c/o NEC Miyagi. Ltd. 2, Aza Raijin Yohioka Taiwa-cho Kurokawa-gun Miyagi / JP | 03 /
Saito, Masaaki c/o NEC Miyagi. Ltd. 2, Aza Raijin Yoshioka Taiwa-cho Kurokawa-gun Miyagi / JP | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90110261.6 | 30.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | JP19890138672 | 30.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13867289 | JP19890179302 | 11.07.1989 Original published format: JP 17930289 | [1990/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400603 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400603 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/14, H04M3/24 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
H04J3/14 (EP);
H04L1/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/49] | H04J3/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Überwachung von Stand-by-Schaltungsanordnungen, geeignet für eine Multiplexier-/Demultiplexier-Einrichtung | [1990/49] | English: | Monitoring method for stand-by circuits suitable for a multiplexing/demultiplexing apparatus | [1990/49] | French: | Procédé de surveillance de circuits en état de veille adaptés pour un dispositif de multiplexage/démultiplexage | [1990/49] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 11.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/21] | 27.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61202539 ; | [Y]JP59154858 ; | [Y]US4266293 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 33 (E-476)(2480) 30 January 1987 & JP-A-61 202 539 ( FUJITSU LIMITED ) 8 September 1986, & JP61202539 A 19860908 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 33 (E-233)(1500) 24 March 1984 & JP-58 212 238 ( NIPPON DENKI K.K. ) 9 December 1983 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 4 (E-288)(1727) 10 January 1985 & JP-A-59 154 858 ( FUJITSU LIMITED ) 3 September 1984, & JP59154858 A 19840903 |