Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.07.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] |
11.07.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.08.1991 [1991/35] |
09.01.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] |
03.11.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.12.1990 [1990/51] |