Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5691890 | Global Dossier | 13.12.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3919036 | 10.06.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0402769 | Global Dossier | 19.12.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3919036 | 10.06.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2018580 | 10.12.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3919036 | 10.06.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3919036 | 13.12.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3919036 | 10.06.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0324004 | 01.02.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3919036 | 10.06.1989 |