EP0393729 - Regenerable filter in exhaust gases of an internal-combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IVECO FIAT S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 10156 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states IVECO FIAT S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 I-10156 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manfre', Giovanni Via Bardonecchia, 11 bis I-10048 Vinovo / IT | 02 /
Giachello, Angelo Lungo Dora Firenze, 25 I-10100 Torino / IT | 03 /
Cuniberti, Francesco Via Breglio 127 I-10100 Torino / IT | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Boggio, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Boggio, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 90110810.0 | 02.12.1987 | [1990/43] | Priority number, date | IT19860067909 | 05.12.1986 Original published format: IT 6790986 | [1990/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0393729 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0393729 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0393729 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/02 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
F01N3/0217 (EP);
F01N3/0218 (EP);
F01N3/022 (EP);
F01N3/0222 (EP);
F01N3/027 (EP);
F01N2330/10 (EP);
F01N2370/22 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/43] | Title | German: | Regenerierbares Abgasfilter für Verbrennungsmotoren | [1990/43] | English: | Regenerable filter in exhaust gases of an internal-combustion engine | [1990/43] | French: | Filtre régénérable pour gaz d'échappement de moteurs à combustion interne | [1990/43] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 10.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87117828.1 / EP0270990 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58137423 ; | [AD]US4276066 (BLY KENNETH B, et al); | [A]US4427418 (KOGISO TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0112634 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]); | [A]US4503672 (STARK TERRENCE L [US], et al); | [A]US4505726 (TAKEUCHI YUKIHISA [JP], et al); | [A]US4505107 (YAMAGUCHI SHUNZO [JP], et al); | [A]US4516993 (TAKEUCHI YUKIHISA [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 252 (C-194)() 09 November 1983, & JP-A-58 137423 (NIPPON TOKUSHU TOGYO) 15 August 1983,, & JP58137423 A 19830815 |