EP0402791 - Multi-port coaxial printed circuit board connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | ||
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hnatuck, Robert James 1009 East Coover Street Mechanicsburg, PA 17055 / US | 02 /
Cohen, Thomas Shackney 475 Aspen Street Middletown, PA 17057 / US | 03 /
Grabbe, Dimitry G. 2160 Rosedale Avenue Middletown, PA 17057 / US | [1990/51] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90110894.4 | 08.06.1990 | [1990/51] | Priority number, date | US19890365069 | 12.06.1989 Original published format: US 365069 | [1990/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0402791 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0402791 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01R17/12, H01R23/68 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
H01R13/6585 (EP,US);
H01R12/737 (EP,US);
H01R24/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/51] | Title | German: | Koaxialer Mehrfach-Leiterplattenverbinder | [1994/22] | English: | Multi-port coaxial printed circuit board connector | [1990/51] | French: | Connecteur coaxial multiple pour plaque à circuit imprimé | [1990/51] |
Former [1990/51] | Mehrfach koaxialer Leiterplattenverbinder | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8600473 (AMP INC [US]); | [A]GB2185160 (TERADYNE INC); | [A]US4548453 (MUMMEY DALE B [US], et al); | [A]US4360244 (FORNEY JR EDGAR W, et al); | [A]US3551874 (VOLINSKIE ROBERT) |