EP0402834 - Circuit for monitoring the voltage of a selected DC power supply in a redundant power supply system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeder, Rolf Rotdornstrasse 18 D-3151 Vöhrum / DE | [1990/51] | Application number, filing date | 90111012.2 | 11.06.1990 | [1990/51] | Priority number, date | DE19893919772 | 16.06.1989 Original published format: DE 3919772 | [1990/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0402834 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0402834 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0402834 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/06, H02J1/10, G06F1/30 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
H02J1/10 (EP);
G06F1/30 (EP);
H02J9/061 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/51] | H02J1/10, H02J9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [1990/51] | Title | German: | Schaltung zum Überwachen der Spannung einer ausgewählten Gleichstromversorgungseinrichtung in einem redundanten Stromversorgungssystem | [1990/51] | English: | Circuit for monitoring the voltage of a selected DC power supply in a redundant power supply system | [1990/51] | French: | Circuit de surveillance de la tension d'un dispositif sélectionné d'alimentation à courant continu dans un système d'alimentation redondant | [1990/51] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/51] | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 20.04.1994 | ES | 20.04.1994 | FR | 20.04.1994 | IT | 20.04.1994 | NL | 20.04.1994 | AT | 11.06.1994 | CH | 30.06.1994 | LI | 30.06.1994 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | DK | 20.04.1994 | |
ES | 20.04.1994 | ||
IT | 20.04.1994 | ||
NL | 20.04.1994 | ||
AT | 11.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.06.1994 | ||
LI | 30.06.1994 | ||
FR | 16.09.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 20.04.1994 | |
IT | 20.04.1994 | ||
NL | 20.04.1994 | ||
AT | 11.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.06.1994 | ||
LI | 30.06.1994 | ||
FR | 16.09.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 20.04.1994 | |
NL | 20.04.1994 | ||
AT | 11.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.06.1994 | ||
LI | 30.06.1994 | ||
FR | 16.09.1994 | ||
Former [1996/02] | NL | 20.04.1994 | |
AT | 11.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.06.1994 | ||
LI | 30.06.1994 | ||
FR | 16.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/31] | NL | 20.04.1994 | |
CH | 30.06.1994 | ||
LI | 30.06.1994 | ||
FR | 16.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | NL | 20.04.1994 | |
FR | 16.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/08] | FR | 16.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH452025 (NIERMEYER LUDWIG [DE]); | [A]FR2337457 (GATES RUBBER CO [US]); | [A]DE3444065 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]WO8704874 (MAGYAR VILLAMOS MUEVEK TROESZT [HU]) |