blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0408887

EP0408887 - Oligosaccharide alditols with an amide bond and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.02.1995
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.1995Refusal of applicationpublished on 12.04.1995 [1995/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Südzucker Aktiengesellschaft Mannheim/Ochsenfurt
Maximilianstrasse 10
68165 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/40]For all designated states
SÜDZUCKER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT MANNHEIM/OCHSENFURT
Maximilianstrasse 10
D-68165 Mannheim / DE
Former [1991/04]For all designated states
SÜDZUCKER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT MANNHEIM/OCHSENFURT
Maximilianstrasse 10
D-68165 Mannheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hahn, Karola
Schwerdstrasse 20
D-6522 Osthofen / DE
02 / Schneider, Bernd, Dr. rer. nat.
Mertesheimer Strasse 25 a
D-6719 Ebertsheim / DE
[1991/04]
Representative(s)Gleiss, Alf-Olav
Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Leitzstraße 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/45]Gleiss & Grosse
Maybachstrasse 6A
D-70469 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1992/39](deleted)
Former [1991/04]Körber, Wolfhart, Dr. rer.nat., et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date90111015.511.06.1990
[1991/04]
Priority number, dateDE1989392336514.07.1989         Original published format: DE 3923365
[1991/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0408887
Date:23.01.1991
Language:DE
[1991/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0408887
Date:20.03.1991
Language:DE
[1991/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.1991
ClassificationIPC:C07H15/04, C07C235/08
[1991/04]
CPC:
C07H15/04 (EP,US); C07C235/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1991/04]
TitleGerman:Oligosaccharidalditole mit Amidbindung sowie Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung[1991/04]
English:Oligosaccharide alditols with an amide bond and process for their preparation[1991/04]
French:Alditols d'oligosaccharides avec une liaison amide et procédé pour leur préparation[1991/04]
File destroyed:03.03.2001
Examination procedure05.09.1991Examination requested  [1991/45]
25.11.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.1994Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1995/15]
20.11.1994Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0114954  (SUEDDEUTSCHE ZUCKER AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0220676  (SUEDDEUTSCHE ZUCKER AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0255033  (SUEDDEUTSCHE ZUCKER AG [DE])
 [X]  - BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, Band 49, Nr. 9, 1976, Seiten 2511-2514; J. YOSHIMURA et al.: "Aminosugars. XXVI. Synthesis of amido-bonded disaccharides containing hexosaminuronic acids"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.