EP0408890 - Two-part aerosol composition and method for increasing the light-reflectivity of an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOX VALLEY SYSTEMS, INC. 640 Industrial Drive Cary Illinois 60013 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states FOX VALLEY SYSTEMS, INC. 640 Industrial Drive Cary, Illinois 60013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smrt, Thomas J. 10014 South Grant Highway Marengo, IL 60152 / US | 02 /
Khan, Abdul Fareed 55 Pleasant Street Hoffmann Estates, IL 60194 / US | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/04] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90111075.9 | 12.06.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | US19890383822 | 21.07.1989 Original published format: US 383822 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0408890 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/33, B05D5/06, G02B5/128 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
B05D5/063 (EP,US);
C09D5/004 (EP,US);
G02B5/128 (EP,US);
G09F13/16 (EP,US);
F21W2111/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/04] | Title | German: | Zeiteilige Aerosolzusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Verbesserung des Lichtreflexionsvermögens an einem Objekt | [1991/04] | English: | Two-part aerosol composition and method for increasing the light-reflectivity of an object | [1991/04] | French: | Composition d'aérosol divisée en deux et procédé pour augmenter le pouvoir de réflexion de la lumière d'un objet | [1991/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 09.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0305074 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]US3700305 (BINGHAM WALLACE KARL); | [A]US3535019 (LONGLET RICHARD A, et al); | [AD]US4329393 (LAPERRE JAMES D, et al); | [A]US4263345 (BINGHAM WALLACE K) |