EP0405221 - Alkylaluminoxane process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHYL CORPORATION Ethyl Tower 451 Florida Boulevard Baton Rouge Louisiana 70801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states ETHYL CORPORATION Ethyl Tower 451 Florida Boulevard Baton Rouge Louisiana 70801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bottelberghe, Scott Alan Rt. 3, Box 170 Waldo, Arkansas 71770 / US | [1991/01] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90111097.3 | 12.06.1990 | [1991/01] | Priority number, date | US19890371192 | 26.06.1989 Original published format: US 371192 | [1991/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0405221 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0405221 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0405221 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/06, C08F4/00 | [1991/01] | CPC: |
C07F5/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR [1991/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkylaluminoxanen | [1991/01] | English: | Alkylaluminoxane process | [1991/01] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'alkylaluminoxanes | [1991/01] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3300458 (MANYIK ROBERT M, et al); | [A]GB1176692 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0257695 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]EP0258924 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [AD]US4772736 (EDWARDS DAVID N [US], et al); | [XP]US4908463 (BOTTELBERGHE SCOTT A [US]) |