EP0404021 - Composite plate used as windowpane for permitting indoor reception of via-satellite broadcasting therethrough [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KASHIWARA MACHINE MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. 1-22, Kawahara-cho Kashiwara-shi Osaka / JP | For all designated states TSUTSUNAKA PLASTIC INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 5-11, Doshi-machi, 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states KASHIWARA MACHINE MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. 1-22, Kawahara-cho Kashiwara-shi Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states TSUTSUNAKA PLASTIC INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 5-11, Doshi-machi, 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mishima, Noboru, c/o Kashiwara Machine MFG. Co. 1-22, Kawahara-cho, Kashiwara Osaka 582 / JP | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90111474.4 | 18.06.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | JP19890071407U | 19.06.1989 Original published format: JP 7140789 U | JP19890204245 | 07.08.1989 Original published format: JP 20424589 | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0404021 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0404021 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, C03C27/12 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
B32B17/10036 (EP);
B32B17/10 (KR);
B32B17/10018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/52] | Title | German: | Verbundscheibe, angewendet als Fensterscheibe, welche den Innenempfang von Satellitenrundfunk ermöglicht | [1990/52] | English: | Composite plate used as windowpane for permitting indoor reception of via-satellite broadcasting therethrough | [1990/52] | French: | Panneau composite, utilisé comme vitre qui permet à l'intérieur, la réception de la radiodiffusion par satellites | [1990/52] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 14.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 01.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/27] | 02.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4710778 (RADOV MITCHELL C [US]); | [Y]DE2014641 (VER GLASWERKE GMBH); | [A]DE3203953 (INST RUNDFUNKTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [E]WO9007199 (MAWZONES DEV [GB]); | [A]WO8404277 (BOLTON NELSON P, et al); | [A]DE8715920U |