EP0405331 - Acoustic sensing device with noise cancellation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.1994 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Battelle-Institut e.V. Am Römerhof 35 Postfach 90 01 60 D-60441 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states BATTELLE-INSTITUT E.V. Am Römerhof 35 Postfach 90 01 60 D-60441 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Föller, Dieter, Dr. Taunusstrasse 13 D-6108 Weiterstadt / DE | [1991/01] | Representative(s) | Reichel, Wolfgang, et al 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | Reichel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 90111750.7 | 21.06.1990 | [1991/01] | Priority number, date | DE19893921307 | 29.06.1989 Original published format: DE 3921307 | [1991/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0405331 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0405331 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/16 | [1991/01] | CPC: |
G10K11/17873 (EP,US);
G10K11/17837 (EP,US);
G10K11/17857 (EP,US);
G10K2210/108 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3013 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3045 (EP,US);
Y10S367/901 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/01] | Title | German: | Akustische Sensoreinrichtung mit Störschallunterdrückung | [1991/01] | English: | Acoustic sensing device with noise cancellation | [1991/01] | French: | Dispositif palpeur acoustique avec suppression de bruit | [1991/01] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 08.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 04.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3821939 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]); | [AD]DE3133107 (LEHNERT VOLKER, et al) | [A] - IBM TECH. DISCL. BULL. Bd. 31, Nr. 8, Januar 1989, ARMONK, NY, US Seiten 256 - 258; 'Audible Noise Suppression' |