EP0427911 - Cast iron and concrete circular manhole cover with ventilation slots [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PASSAVANT-WERKE AG 65322 Aarbergen 7 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/21] | For all designated states PASSAVANT-WERKE AG D-65322 Aarbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunz, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Talblick 3 D-6209 Aarbergen 1 / DE | 02 /
Fuchs, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Am Goldborn 11b D-6251 Hahnstätten / DE | [1991/21] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/21] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90111781.2 | 21.06.1990 | [1991/21] | Priority number, date | DE19893936929 | 06.11.1989 Original published format: DE 3936929 | [1991/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0427911 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0427911 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/14 | [1991/21] | CPC: |
E02D29/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/21] | Title | German: | Kreisrunder Schachtdeckel aus Gusseisen und Beton mit Lüftungsöffnungen | [1991/21] | English: | Cast iron and concrete circular manhole cover with ventilation slots | [1991/21] | French: | Couvercle circulaire pour regards en fonte et béton avec ouvertures de ventilation | [1991/21] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/21] | 01.08.1991 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1991 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 26.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1364022 ; | [AD]DE2857528 (PASSAVANT WERKE) |