Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE105545T | 15.05.1994 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3927761 | 23.08.1989 | EP90111817 | 22.06.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN170318 | 14.03.1992 | B | Priority number | Date | IN235MA1990 | DE3927761 | 23.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0413918 | Global Dossier | 11.05.1994 | B1 | EP0413918 | 22.01.1992 | A3 | EP0413918 | 27.02.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3927761 | 23.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3927761 | 27.11.1997 | C2 | DE3927761 | 28.02.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3927761 | 23.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU208108 | 30.08.1993 | B | HUT54613 | 28.03.1991 | A | HU905277D0 | 28.02.1991 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE3927761 | 23.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH03109354 | 09.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3927761 | 23.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT94958 | 22.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3927761 | 23.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5041619 | 20.08.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3927761 | 23.08.1989 |