EP0413918 - Method for the production of alkoxyalkylidenemalonic acid esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 45764 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-45764 Marl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Itter, Franz-Albert, Dr. Auf dem Hügel 109 D-5300 Bonn 1 / DE | 02 /
Steffen, Klaus-Dieter, Dr. Röckelstrasse 36 D-5202 Hennef 1 / DE | [1991/09] | Application number, filing date | 90111817.4 | 22.06.1990 | [1991/09] | Priority number, date | DE19893927761 | 23.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3927761 | [1991/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0413918 | Date: | 26.11.1991 | [1992/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0413918 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0413918 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/734, C07C67/343 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
C07C69/734 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkoxyalkylidenmalonsäureestern | [1991/09] | English: | Method for the production of alkoxyalkylidenemalonic acid esters | [1991/09] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'esters de l'acide alkoxyalkylidène malonique | [1991/09] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 03.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0152319 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]); | [A]FR2589466 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]) |