EP0463199 - Process and device for manufacturing average or highly viscous masses of two or multiple components by mixing the components together [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOSSCHEMIE GmbH Esinger Steinweg 50 25436 Uetersen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states VOSSCHEMIE GmbH Esinger Steinweg 50 D-25436 Uetersen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voss, Klaus-Wilhelm Theodor-Storm-Allee 48 D-2082 Uetersen / DE | [1992/01] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10 D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90112000.6 | 25.06.1990 | [1992/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0463199 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0463199 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/10, B01F7/00, B29B7/02, B29B7/04, B29B7/06, B29B7/84 | [1993/34] | CPC: |
B28C5/26 (EP,US);
B01F29/82 (EP,US);
B01F35/55 (EP,US);
B29B7/10 (EP);
B29B7/22 (EP);
B01F23/47 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/01] | B01F3/10, B01F7/00, B01D19/00, B29B7/84 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von mittel- oder höherviskosen Zwei- oder Mehrkomponenten-Massen durch Vermischen der Komponenten miteinander | [1992/01] | English: | Process and device for manufacturing average or highly viscous masses of two or multiple components by mixing the components together | [1992/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la préparation des masses de deux ou plusieurs constituants à moyenne ou haute viscosité pour mélange de tels constituants | [1992/01] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 28.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 25.08.1993 | ES | 25.08.1993 | GR | 25.08.1993 | IT | 25.08.1993 | NL | 25.08.1993 | SE | 25.08.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | DK | 25.08.1993 | |
GR | 25.08.1993 | ||
IT | 25.08.1993 | ||
NL | 25.08.1993 | ||
SE | 25.08.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 25.08.1993 | |
IT | 25.08.1993 | ||
NL | 25.08.1993 | ||
SE | 25.08.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 25.08.1993 | |
NL | 25.08.1993 | ||
SE | 25.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | NL | 25.08.1993 | |
SE | 25.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/16] | SE | 25.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1544055 ; | [A]DE2417137 | [A] - CHEMIE-INGENIEUR-TECHNIK Nr. 9, 1964, Seiten 898-906, Weinheim, DE; W. RODENACKER: "Keilspaltmaschinen - Fördern und Evakuieren von nicht-newtonschen Stoffen" |