EP0404197 - Arylalkylamine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 1-6-1, Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | For all designated states Yamato, Masatoshi 1507-204, Tsutaka Okayama-shi Okoyama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohte-Machi Itchome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Yamato, Masatoshi 1507-204, Tsutaka Okayama-shi, Okoyama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamato, Masatoshi 1507-204 Tsutaka Okayama-shi, Okayama-ken / JP | 02 /
Hashigaki, Kuniko 806-1 Yokoikami Okayama-shi, Okayama-ken / JP | 03 /
Manabe, Haruhiko 247-1 Takehara, Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Ohmori, Kenji 2-14-3 Fuyo-dai Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90112023.8 | 25.06.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | JP19890162021 | 23.06.1989 Original published format: JP 16202189 | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0404197 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0404197 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/76, C07D217/14, C07C215/08, C07D405/12, C07D407/12, C07D409/12, A61K31/35, // (C07D405/12, 311:00, 213:00),(C07D407/12, 311:00, 307:00),(C07D409/12, 333:00, 311:00) | [1990/52] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07C215/52 (EP,US);
C07D217/14 (EP,US);
C07D311/76 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/52] | Title | German: | Arylalkylaminderivate | [1990/52] | English: | Arylalkylamine derivatives | [1990/52] | French: | Dérivés arylalkylaminés | [1990/52] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/38] | 22.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57139066 ; | [A]JP57159713 ; | [A]FR2336927 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | [A]AT344180B (MALESCI SAS [IT]); | [A]FR2500823 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [AD]EP0157206 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 235 (C-136)(1113) 20 November 1982, & JP-A-57 139066 (FUJISAWA YAKUHIN KOGYO K.K.) 27 August 1982,, & JP57139066 A 19820827 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 3 (C-143)(1148) 07 January 1983, & JP-A-57 159713 (MASATOSHI YAMATO) 01 October 1982,, & JP57159713 A 19821001 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, no. 17, 29 April 1985 Columbus, Ohio, USA Samodurova,A.G. et al.: "Isochroman derivatives.VII.Synthesis and biological activity of some N-arylalkyl-substituted 1-isochromanylalkylamines." & Arm.Khim.Zh.1984,37[8],493-7 page 587; column 2; ref. no. 149043Y EP 90112023030 | [A] - Chemical and Pharmaceutical Bulletin vol. 36, no. 9, September 1988, Tokyo pages 3453 - 3461; Masatoshi Yamato et al.: "Synthesis and Antiulcer Activity of[Isochroman-1-yl]alkylamines.II" |